Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Remedies for Shoplifting and Employee Theft
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Vallario, Dumais, Anderson, Atterbeary, Barron, Carter, Morales, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Smith, and Valentino-Smith
Status
Veto sustained (0-135)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a specified provision of law providing that a responsible person is civilly liable to a merchant for specified civil penalties for shoplifting and employee theft; altering requirements for specified demand letters relating to alleged acts of shoplifting or employee theft; providing that a responsible person who prevails in a specified civil action is entitled to an award of court costs and reasonable attorney's fees, under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0508
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1239 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-135)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (83-52)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {298679/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-3)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Delegates Smith, Morales, and Sanchez
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senators Ramirez, Brochin, and Norman
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (86-55)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/17/2017 Veto sustained (0-135)
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/14/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (83-52) 43A
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 44
Senate 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {298679/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-3) 58
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Delegates Smith, Morales, and Sanchez 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senators Ramirez, Brochin, and Norman 62
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (86-55) 70
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1301, 3-1302, 3-1303, 3-1304, 3-1305, 3-1306, 3-1306.1, 3-1307, 3-1308, 3-1309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM