Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement – Specialized Printing Services Contracts – Board of Public Works Approval
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Public Works to approve the award of a procurement contract for specialized printing services before a unit may execute the contract; prohibiting the Board from delegating its authority to approve the award of a procurement contract for specialized printing services; and defining "specialized printing services" as services for the printing of a ballot or a document that contains sensitive or personally identifiable information.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0157
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/08/2020
Legislative Date
9/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/08/2020 9/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Procurement – Specialized Printing Services Contracts – Board of Public Works Approval
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/12/2021 9:09 AM