Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Optometrists and Physicians - Prescriptions for Lenses - Expiration Dates
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Metzgar, Miele, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that licensed optometrists and licensed physicians ensure that prescriptions for specified lenses contain an expiration date of not more than 24 months from the dates the patients are first examined; requiring that specified optometrists and specified physicians who provide prescriptions with less than a 24-month expiration enter the reason in the patient's medical record and provide the patient with a written and an oral explanation; and applying the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Optometrists and Physicians - Prescriptions for Lenses - Expiration Dates
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-404.5, 14-508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM