Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support, Custody, and Visitation - Award of Expenses - Suit Money
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding suit money to the expenses that the court is authorized, at any point in a certain proceeding, to award to a certain party under certain circumstances in a case concerning child support, custody, or visitation and after making certain considerations; adding suit money to the expenses that the court is required to award to a certain party under certain circumstances and absent a certain finding; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Delegate J. Lewis) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {512410/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-8)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Child Support, Custody, and Visitation - Award of Expenses - Suit Money
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted 35
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Delegate J. Lewis) Adopted 35
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Floor Committee Amendment {512410/1 Adopted 37
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Text - Third - Child Support, Custody, and Visitation - Award of Expenses - Suit Money
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Third Reading Passed (126-8) 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 39
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/15/2020 10:28 AM