Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Service of Process - Increase in Sheriff's Fees - Distribution to Rental Allowance Program Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Mitchell, Anderson, Branch, Bromwell, Carter, Clippinger, McHale, Vaughn, M. Washington, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing fees for service of process of papers by a sheriff; requiring that $10 of the fees be distributed to a fund established for the Rental Allowance Program of the Department of Housing and Community Development; establishing the Rental Allowance Program Fund; specifying that the Fund is a special, nonlapsing fund; providing that the money in the Fund may be used only for specified purposes; adding the Fund to the list of funds the interest earnings of which are exempt from accruing to the General Fund of the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0156
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0413 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/29/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/29/2013 1/29/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Reassigned to Judiciary 16
House 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-1401, 4-1403, 4-1407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM