Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Occupational Safety and Health - Inspections and Assessments of Civil Penalties - Limitations
Sponsored by
Delegate Serafini
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry or an authorized representative of the Commissioner to provide an employer written notice of an intent to inspect the place of employment, at least 14 days before the inspection is to occur, if the Commissioner or an authorized representative of the Commissioner has not inspected the place of employment in the immediately preceding 3 years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-208, 5-208.1, 5-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM