Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Causes - Permanency Plans - Age Restrictions on Use of Another Planned Permanent Living Arrangement
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that another planned permanent living arrangement may be a child's permanency plan only if the child is at least 16 years old.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0360
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/19 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {918673/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Delegates Rosenberg, Proctor, and Glass
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Motion Recede (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Committee Amendment {918673/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 25
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Second Reading Passed 25
House 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Special Order until 2/19 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 27
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 30
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 30
Senate 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {918673/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 58
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Delegates Rosenberg, Proctor, and Glass 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senate Recede 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Motion Recede (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Committee Amendment {918673/1 Withdrawn 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-326, 5-525 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM