Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Staff - Designation and Duties of Executive Director
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs and Ready
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene, instead of the State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors, to employ specified staff; authorizing the Secretary to designate one of the staff as executive director; requiring the executive director to manage specified staff and perform specified administrative functions; and prohibiting the executive director from directly conducting specified investigations or inspections.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0446
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM