Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures
Sponsored by
Baltimore County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified provisions of law govern the nomination and election of judges of the orphans' court in Baltimore County; authorizing a candidate for judge of the orphans' court in Baltimore County to file and appear on primary election ballots; requiring that the three candidates of each principal political party receiving the largest number of votes in the primary election appear on the general election ballot; prohibiting the political party affiliation of candidates from being included on the general election ballot; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0151
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-203, 5-301, 8-901 through 8-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM