Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Statement on Disclosure
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain requirement that a life insurer include, in a certain manner, a certain statement on an application or an endorsement for a policy of life insurance on the life of a minor to allow the life insurer to include the statement on a certain disclosure; and applying the Act to policies of life insurance on the life of a minor issued or delivered in the State on or after January 1, 2020.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0185
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Statement on Disclosure
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {856082/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Statement on Disclosure
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed 47-0
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Statement on Disclosure
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Statement on Disclosure
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {856082/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Statement on Disclosure
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Finance 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed 47-0 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Text - Chapter - Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Statement on Disclosure
(   16-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page