Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
Sponsored by
Delegate Guyton
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Victim Services to develop a poster to notify a victim of the right to request a certain private room in a law enforcement agency or unit when reporting a crime, other than homicide, that primarily involves injury to a person; requiring a certain law enforcement agency to display a poster developed by the State Board of Victim Services informing a victim of the right to request a private room; and requiring a certain law enforcement agency to provide a certain private room to a certain victim.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1294 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/08/2020
Legislative Date
7/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/08/2020 7/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 4:20 PM