Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - School Facilities - Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified bonds, notes, or other obligations used for specified purposes in connection with specified school facilities in Baltimore City to be payable from revenues and receipts from a specified beverage container tax, from the proceeds, participation rent, and other fees payable by specified video lottery facilities, or from specified other revenues; authorizing specified revenues and receipts to be irrevocably pledged in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0270
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM