Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Optional Retirement Program - Payment of Benefits - Criteria
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Carter, and Oaks
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring benefits from the Optional Retirement Program to be payable beginning at the earlier of the date that a participating employee separates from employment or becomes 70 years and 6 months old; and providing that obligations or rights under presently existing annuity contracts may not be impaired by the Act.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2014 3/11/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   30-101, 30-201, 30-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM