Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Misdemeanor Convictions
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Carter, and Oaks
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of a police or court record if the person was convicted of a specified misdemeanor and was under 35 years of age at the time of the conviction; and specifying the time period within which a petition for expungement based on a conviction of a misdemeanor may not be filed.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0211
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM