Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Prohibitions on Participation
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, W. Miller, Rose, and West
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that specified prohibitions on participation in procurement apply only for a specified period of time following the issuance of an invitation for bids or a request for proposals; providing that specified prohibitions on participation in procurement do not apply to a subsequent invitation for bids or request for proposals for which the specifications are reused under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {696587/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {334635/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 3:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {696587/1 Report Adopted 31
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 33
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments {334635/1 Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM