Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Assessment Applicability and Report on State–Based Individual Market Health Insurance Subsidies
Sponsored by
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 105
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying the applicability of a certain assessment by the State to certain entities for certain products that were subject to § 9010 of the Affordable Care Act, as in effect on December 1, 2019; requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to report to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee by December 1, 2020, on certain information related to establishing a State-based individual subsidy program in Maryland.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0124
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {766086/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-9)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 105
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a State-Based Health Insurance Subsidies Program
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {766086/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Assessment Applicability and Report on State–Based Individual Market Health Insurance Subsidies
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (36-9) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49BClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 105
Text - Chapter - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Assessment Applicability and Report on State–Based Individual Market Health Insurance Subsidies
(   6-102.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:39 PM
Click to return on the top page