Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers
Sponsored by
Delegates Cluster, Afzali, Buckel, Folden, Kittleman, Long, Malone, McConkey, Metzgar, and Vogt
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that at least one school resource officer be assigned to each public school in the State; requiring specified public schools to hire retired law enforcement officers as school resource officers for the school; requiring specified school resource officers to obtain a special police officer commission issued by the Department of State Police; requiring the county superintendent to submit an application to the Secretary of State Police for a special police commission for each school resource officer hired; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0028 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 26-102, 7-1701 through 7-1705, 7-438 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM