Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Online Campaign Material - Use of Deepfakes
Sponsored by
Delegates Cain, Bartlett, Carey, Chang, and Chisholm
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain persons from willfully or knowingly influencing or attempting to influence a voter's decision to go to the polls or to cast a vote for a particular candidate by publishing, distributing, or disseminating a deepfake online within 90 days of an election; providing that the prohibition does not apply to a person who discloses certain information on the deepfake; providing that a certain person who violates the Act is guilty of a misdemeanor and may be subject to a certain fine and imprisonment or both; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Online Campaign Material - Use of Deepfakes
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Online Campaign Material - Use of Deepfakes
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/7/2020 9:09 AM