Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Unreimbursed Expenses of Foster Parents - Child Placement Agency
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of a "foster parent" to include individuals approved by specified child placement agencies and specified treatment foster parents for purposes of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for unreimbursed expenses; requiring the Department of Human Resources to determine the expenses required for the subtraction modification; requiring the Department to submit a list of the approved necessary expenses to the Comptroller; applying the Act to taxable years after December 31, 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM