Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Orphans' Court - Change of Name to Probate Court
Sponsored by
Delegate Bromwell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to change the name of each orphans' court in this State to the probate court; changing references to the orphans' court in the Annotated Code to the probate court on the passage and ratification of a specified constitutional amendment; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; prohibiting the use of specified office supplies until existing office supplies are depleted; etc.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1257 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Contingency - on enactment of a constitutional amendment and on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 1-205, 12-101, 12-201, 12-308, 12-501, 12-502, 12-701 )
(   9-210 )
(   1-103, 13-105, 13-106, 13-107, 13-301, 2-101, 2-106, 2-107, 2-108, 2-109, 5-206, 5-403, 5-708 )
(   25-509, 28-106, 28-207 )
(   12-101, 7-216 )
(   13-302, 13-510, 13-511, 7-101 )
(   1, 18, 20, 3A, 40, 41, 4B, 8 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM