Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Polygraph Examination
Sponsored by
Delegates Cluster, Arentz, Aumann, Cassilly, Folden, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kittleman, Metzgar, Miele, W. Miller, Parrott, Szeliga, West, and B. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services to require an individual to pass a polygraph examination before being appointed to serve as a correctional officer in a correctional facility; and requiring the Secretary to adopt regulations governing the administration of the polygraph examination required by the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0189
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0962 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-10)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/30/2015 1/30/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Third Reading Passed (124-10) 32
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 First Reading Finance 32
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM