Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pilot Program - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Aumann, Brooks, Ciliberti, Cluster, Folden, Grammer, Jameson, Luedtke, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, O'Donnell, Patterson, West, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to adopt regulations requiring one video lottery facility licensee to adopt procedures to offer players the opportunity to donate coins, when receiving cash on payout, to the Maryland Veterans Trust Fund and to require the licensee to attach donation boxes near exits in the video lottery facility, with the proceeds dedicated to the Maryland Veterans Trust Fund; and requiring the Commission to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1004
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {675067/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {309934/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {675067/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 43
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments {309934/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 52
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-04, 9-913 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM