Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility – Court–Ordered Evaluation
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Atterbeary, Dumais, Krebs, Rose, Shoemaker, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court after a certain finding of incompetency or not criminally responsible due to a mental disorder to order the Maryland Department of Health as soon as possible after the defendant's admission, but not later than 48 hours, to evaluate a defendant, to develop a treatment plan, and to make a determination as to whether the defendant is a danger to self or others under certain circumstances; requiring a panel to convene within 9 days after a certain individual's refusal of medication for certain purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0361
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0650 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {672716/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter -
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Court-Ordered Medication
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {672716/1 Adopted 40
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure – Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility – Court–Ordered Evaluation
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702
Text - Chapter -
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-106, 3-112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM