Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Presidential Electors - Selection and Voting
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the procedures for the selection of presidential elector nominees; requiring certain presidential elector nominees and alternates to execute a certain pledge; requiring the Governor to certify certain presidential electors and make certain statements in the certificate of ascertainment; requiring the State Administrator of Elections to preside at a certain meeting of certain presidential electors; requiring a certain individual to execute a certain pledge to qualify as a substitute presidential elector; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 4 and 5 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/14/2020
Legislative Date
7/14/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Presidential Electors - Selection and Voting
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/14/2020 7/14/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law - Presidential Electors - Selection and Voting
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 11:43 AM