Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State and County Governments - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State and County Building Grounds
Sponsored by
Delegates Conway, Cane, Eckardt, Otto, Rudolph, Hammen, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Costa, Cullison, Donoghue, Elliott, Hubbard, Kach, A. Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Ready, Reznik, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a county to cause the POW/MIA flag to be flown on the grounds of a specified county building whenever the flag of the United States is flown; requiring the Secretary of General Services and the Secretary of Transportation to cause the POW/MIA flag to be flown on the grounds of State buildings under their control whenever the flag of the United States is flown; and defining "POW/MIA flag" as the POW/MIA Flag of the National League of Families of American Prisoners and Missing in Southeast Asia.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0036
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {866489/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {866489/1 Report Adopted 36
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 38
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM