Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Reimbursement of Expenses for Community College Certification and Licensure
Sponsored by
Delegates Hornberger, Luedtke, Afzali, Buckel, Ebersole, C. Howard, Long, Mosby, Reilly, Shoemaker, Walker, M. Washington, Wilkins, Kaiser, Turner, D. Barnes, Patterson, Rose, Simonaire, Tarlau, A. Washington, and Jackson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing recipients of a senatorial or delegate scholarship to use the scholarship to reimburse certain expenses for certificate or license programs or for certain courses or sequences of courses at community colleges; and exempting certain applicants from the requirement that certain senatorial scholarship recipients take a certain examination and be enrolled in certain institutions.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0586
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0623 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {105060/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {904536/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Reimbursement of Certificate and License Programs
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable with Amendments {105060/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Reimbursement of Expenses for Community College Certification and Licensure
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {904536/1 Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Reimbursement of Expenses for Community College Certification and Licensure
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Reimbursement of Expenses for Community College Certification and Licensure
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-401, 18-402, 18-405, 18-406, 18-501, 18-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM