Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Academic Forgiveness Policy - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey, Gaines, Haynes, McIntosh, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring institutions of higher education to develop and implement an academic forgiveness policy on or before August 1, 2019, that applies to applicants who earned unsatisfactory or failing grades at a prior institution of higher education under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0663 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - Academic Forgiveness Policy - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - Academic Forgiveness Policy - Established
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-126 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM