Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates D.M. Davis, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Boyce, Carr, Charles, Conaway, Crosby, Crutchfield, D.E. Davis, Fennell, W. Fisher, Harrison, Healey, Henson, Holmes, Ivey, M. Jackson, Kerr, Lehman, J. Lewis, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Turner, Valderrama, Walker, Washington, and Williams
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Transportation promptly to undertake all steps necessary to complete the design, engineering, and National Environmental Policy Act process and secure a record of decision for the Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project; requiring the Governor to include in the annual State budget an appropriation of $12,000,000 from the Transportation Trust Fund in fiscal years 2022 and $15,000,000 in fiscal year 2023 for certain purposes related to the Project; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0105
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Text - First - Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/29/2020 3:09 PM