Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Child Care Products Containing Flame-Retardant Chemicals - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Angel, Cullison, Bromwell, Hayes, Kelly, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from importing, selling, or offering for sale specified child care products or furniture containing specified flame-retardant chemicals; authorizing the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to suspend implementation of specified provisions of the Act if the Secretary makes a specified determination; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt specified regulations on or before January 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Child Care Products Containing Flame-Retardant Chemicals - Prohibition
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM