Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Choice Policy
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Bagnall, Bartlett, Krebs, R. Lewis, Shetty, and Stewart
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a student in a public school or nonpublic school to choose not to participate in or observe, in whole or in part, classwork or an assessment that includes certain actions conducted on a live, dead, or severed part of an animal; authorizing a student to choose not to participate in or observe the classwork or assessment on the day that it is assigned; requiring a certain student to complete the required classwork or assessment by a certain alternative educational method that meets certain requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0188
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0369 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Choice Policy
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-125 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM