Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Bay Trust - Investment Options - Expansion
Sponsored by
Delegate S. Robinson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Chesapeake Bay Trust to invest any money of the Trust in marketable equity securities, marketable equity-related mutual funds, or debt-related mutual funds; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0106
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {260516/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-12)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {260516/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (125-12) 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Senate 4/06/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM