Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the interest rate on tax deficiencies and refunds to 2 percentage points above a specified underpayment rate established under the Internal Revenue Code; providing that the interest rate may not be less than specified rates for 2014 through 2017; repealing a requirement that the Comptroller annually set the interest rate; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0120
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM