Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Acevero, Attar, Bagnall, Bartlett, Bhandari, Boyce, Bridges, Cain, Cardin, Carr, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, W. Fisher, Forbes, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Guyton, Henson, Hettleman, Hill, Ivey, C. Jackson, Kelly, Korman, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Turner, Valderrama, Wells, Wilkins, Williams, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to ensure that each public school provide, at no charge to students, menstrual hygiene products via dispensers in the restrooms at the school; requiring a public middle or high school to install menstrual hygiene product dispensers in at least two restrooms on or before October 1, 2020, and certain restrooms on or before August 1, 2024; requiring a public elementary school to install menstrual hygiene product dispensers in at least one restroom by October 1, 2020; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {965563/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-31)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {965563/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (100-31) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-446 )
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 2:19 PM