Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Board of Education - Salaries and Expenses
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the salary of the chair of the Charles County Board of Education beginning in the year 2015 to $7,000 annually; increasing the salary for the vice chair and other nonstudent members of the county board beginning in the year 2015 to $6,000 and compensation for travel and other expenses to $800 annually; providing that members of the county board may be reimbursed for specified expenses after submitting expense vouchers and supporting receipts; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0203
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 42
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Second Reading Passed 42
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 43
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41A
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-501, 3-502, 3-503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM