Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   HB0209 - 2015RS
   CH0001 - 2016RS
Title
Howard County - Room Rental Tax - Room Rental Fee Ho. Co. 12-15
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2016
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that the Howard County room rental tax applies to the total charge for the rental of a room, including any room rental fee charged by a room rental intermediary but not including any tax; and defining specified terms.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {325069/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-44)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-17)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2015
Legislative Date
5/22/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Veto overridden (90-51)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/25/2016 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-33)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto overridden (32-14)
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2016
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {325069/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (90-44) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47A
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed (30-17) 57
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/26/2015 5/22/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House 1/14/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
House 1/14/2016 1/20/2016 Veto overridden (90-51)
Senate 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/25/2016 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-33)
Senate 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Veto overridden (32-14)
Post Passage 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2016
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20.400 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM