Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Temporary Licenses to Practice Physical Therapy and Limited Physical Therapy
Sponsored by
Delegate Bhandari
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners to issue a temporary license to practice physical therapy and limited physical therapy to certain applicants who meet certain requirements; providing that a temporary license authorizes certain individuals to practice limited physical therapy or physical therapy under direct supervision and is valid until a certain event occurs; altering the grounds on which the Board may take certain disciplinary action; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Temporary Licenses to Practice Physical Therapy and Limited Physical Therapy
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/12/2021 10:25 AM