Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Delegates Vitale, Dwyer, George, McDermott, and Schuh
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a provision of law so as to prohibit a person with a specified mental disorder from possessing a regulated firearm if the mental disorder impairs the mental or emotional functioning of the person in a specified manner, instead of if the person has a specified history of violent behavior; prohibiting the Secretary of State Police from issuing a handgun permit to a specified person unless a specified ground for exemption applies; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1135 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-133, 5-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM