Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Days of Operation
Sponsored by
Delegate Bhandari
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring an early voting center to be open beginning the second Thursday before a primary or general election through the Saturday, rather than the Thursday, before the election.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Days of Operation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Days of Operation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/12/2021 10:27 AM