Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Turner, Atterbeary, Barkley, Brooks, Ebersole, Hill, Hixson, Jalisi, Lam, Pendergrass, Sophocleus, and B. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing a maximum fine of $500 for a violation of specified prohibitions against using a handheld telephone while driving a motor vehicle; providing that the court may waive the penalty for a person convicted of a first offense who provides proof that the person has acquired specified phone accessories that will allow the person to operate a motor vehicle in accordance with specified provisions of law; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {800719/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-30)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Favorable with Amendments {800719/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Third Reading Passed (107-30) 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1124.2, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM