Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Brooks, Cardin, Chang, Conaway, Crutchfield, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Guyton, Healey, Hettleman, Jalisi, Korman, Lafferty, J. Lewis, Lisanti, Luedtke, Moon, Shetty, Stewart, Sydnor, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the date, to on or before December 31, 2020, by which the Department of Natural Resources is required to prepare a certain fishery management plan for the cownose ray species, subject to available funding; and continuing the prohibition on a person sponsoring, conducting, or participating in a cownose ray fishing contest in State waters until the Department prepares a fishery management plan, as required by certain provisions of law, for the cownose ray species.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0143
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {440018/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-4)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {440018/1 Adopted 35
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-4) 37
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Text - Chapter - Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/11/2020 9:08 AM