Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or Childbirth
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Angel, Barkley, B. Barnes, Cullison, Davis, Frick, Glenn, Jameson, Kelly, Korman, Lisanti, Luedtke, A. Miller, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Queen, Tarlau, Valderrama, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring employers to make reasonable accommodations for employees and applicants for employment who have known limitations due to conditions related to pregnancy or childbirth; establishing a rebuttable presumption that a specified accommodation is not an undue hardship if the employer would provide it to an employee with a disability; requiring the Commission on Civil Rights to develop specified courses and public education programs regarding specified rights and responsibilities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or Childbirth
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing canceled
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM