Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources Police Force - Number of Officers
Sponsored by
Delegate Cane
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Stating the intent of the General Assembly that the Governor include funding in the State budget on a phased-in basis to employ additional Natural Resources police officers to achieve specified staffing levels.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0208
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0318 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
Reassigned to Environmental Matters and Appropriations
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {780719/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-25)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
52
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 Reassigned to Environmental Matters and Appropriations 14
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {780719/1 Report Adopted 53
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (108-25) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation 52
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM