Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Preventive Medical Care - Consent by Minors
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Barron, Carr, Fennell, Hill, C. Howard, Kelly, Lam, Patterson, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified provision of law to provide that treatment to which a minor may consent includes medical care related to prevention of or advice about sexually transmitted infection and disease.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0289
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page