Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Early Voting Access Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Braveboy, and Cardin
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the number of early voting centers that are required to be established in each county for a regularly scheduled general election; authorizing the State Board of Elections, in collaboration with the local boards of elections, to increase the number of early voting centers in each county for a regularly scheduled primary election; and requiring that early voting centers be open for specified days and hours before regularly scheduled primary and general elections.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0373
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM