Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Open Meetings Act - Requirements for Agendas
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Fisher, Kittleman, W. Miller, Hammen, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a public body to make available an agenda containing specified information if the agenda has been determined at the time a public body gives notice of the meeting or, if an agenda has not been determined at the time of the meeting notice, the public body shall make available the agenda at least 24 hours before the meeting; and authorizing a public body to make available an agenda within a reasonable time after a meeting is held under specified circumstances.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0583 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {106085/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-4)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {106085/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-4) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Second Reading Passed 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 68
House 4/12/2016 4/09/2016 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM