Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain expenses paid or incurred during the taxable year in carrying on a trade or business as a certain medical cannabis grower, processor, dispensary, or independent testing laboratory; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1210 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
House 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Last Updated: 1/25/2021 12:36 PM
Click to return on the top page