Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Service Fee Exemption - Charity Selection Period
Sponsored by
Delegates McDermott, Afzali, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Boteler, Cluster, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, Frank, Haddaway-Riccio, Hough, Jacobs, Krebs, McComas, Otto, Parrott, Smigiel, Stocksdale, and Vitale
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a specified time period during which a State employee who is exempt from paying service fees to a collective bargaining organization may select the charitable organization that will receive payments from the employee during a specified period of time; and establishing a specified time period during which the employee may change the charitable organization selected by the employee.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM