Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Evidence of Prior Sexual Offense - Admissibility
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Wilson and Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, in a prosecution for a specified sexual offense, the court from barring the introduction of specified evidence that the defendant committed a prior sexual offense on the ground that the admission is unfairly prejudicial unless the court makes a specified finding; prohibiting a State's Attorney from introducing specified evidence under specified circumstances; prohibiting specified evidence from being disclosed to a jury or introduced at trial unless the court has held a specified hearing; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM