Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Workers' Compensation Commission - Issuance of Subpoenas
Sponsored by
Delegates Jameson, Love, and Minnick
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Workers' Compensation Commission, on a request of a party to a proceeding pending before the Commission, to issue a subpoena for specified purposes; authorizing the Commission to assess the whole cost of the proceeding against the requesting party if the Commission determines after an evidentiary hearing that the subpoena was requested in bad faith; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0216
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {943494/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable with Amendments {943494/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Finance 45
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM