Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Registration and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Hixson, Krimm, Lam, Stein, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Decreasing the aggregate amount to $1,000 of independent expenditures or disbursements for electioneering communications that a person may make before being required to file a specified registration form and a specified report; requiring a specified registration form and a specified report to be filed with the State Board of Elections within 48 hours after a day on which a person makes the aggregate disbursements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-306, 13-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM